This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 16:14:06 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N.A. VS YOUMANS, SABRINA L

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 TD BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YOUMANS, SABRINA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1311

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA N.A.

TD BANK USA N. A.

Defendant

YOUMANS SABRINA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC

BOONE STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/4/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

11/1/2018: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/26/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/20/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice of Entry of Judgment - or Order

2/1/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment - or Order

Default Judgment

11/2/2017: Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

10/24/2017: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal

10/24/2017: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/24/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/24/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/6/2017: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: SABRINA L YOUMANS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (SAN DIEGO): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 105.00; Interest Credits: 59.85; Principal Credits: 1,594.13; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (SAN DIEGO); Issued by: Clerk; County: SAN DIEGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: SABRINA L YOUMANS (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 38.25; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: SABRINA L YOUMANS (Defendant); Interest: 38.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to SABRINA L YOUMANS; On the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA N. A. on 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from 11/02/2017 to 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 1033; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: SABRINA L YOUMANS (Defendant); Service Date: 08/17/2017; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/03/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY RICK BROWN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853104. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOONE STEPHANIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE