This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2019 at 03:53:37 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS REBECCA V BARROSO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REBECCA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7405

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

BARROSO REBECCA V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMONSON TODD C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • Hearing12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: REBECCA V BARROSO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: REBECCA V BARROSO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD Bank USA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: REBECCA V BARROSO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.