This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 08:57:23 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA VS OLSEN, BARBARA D

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 TD BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLSEN, BARBARA D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4426

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA NA

TD BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

OLSEN BARBARA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CIR FIRM OFFICES INTERNATIONAL - VLACHOS, MICHAEL

Attorney at CIR FIRM OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

RUIZ ABRIL FIONA

VLACHOS MICHAEL ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/17/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration (name extension) - Re Brief Summary Of The Case

8/17/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Re Brief Summary Of The Case

Request for Dismissal

8/17/2018: Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney

8/17/2018: Association of Attorney

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/17/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

8/17/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/17/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment

8/23/2018: Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- (TD BANK USA N.A.) (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from (TD BANK USA NA) to (TD BANK USA N.A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketAddress for MICHAEL VLACHOS, ESQ (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 02/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (TD BANK USA N.A.) against Defendant (OLSEN, BARBARA D) on the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA NA on 03/08/2017 for the principal amount of $2,990.66 and costs of $294.00 for a total of $3,284.66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA NA on 03/08/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N.A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 1033; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N.A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Brief Summary Of The Case; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N.A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N.A.) (Plaintiff); As to: BARBARA D OLSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to BARBARA D OLSEN; On the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA NA on 03/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Abril Fiona Ruiz (Attorney); As to: (TD BANK USA N.A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: MICHAEL VLACHOS, ESQ (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N.A.) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO BARBARA D. OLSEN SUB SERVED ON 040417 MAILED ON 040517 DEC DIL ATTACHED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/21/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY RICK BROWN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853007. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less