This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 15:51:39 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N.A. VS MIRZAKHANYAN, SHARESE S

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 TD BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIRZAKHANYAN, SHARESE S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1283

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

TD BANK USA N. A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

MIRZAKHANYAN SHARESE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC

BOONE STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/5/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice of Entry of Judgment - or Order

1/22/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment - or Order

Default Judgment

12/11/2017: Default Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/11/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/4/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

12/4/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

12/4/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/4/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/15/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

6/14/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (TARGET NATIONAL BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: SHARESE S MIRZAKHANYAN (Defendant); Interest: 32.68; Service Date: 01/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (TARGET NATIONAL BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (TD BANK USA N. A.) AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (TARGET NATIONAL BANK) against Defendant (MIRZAKHANYAN, SHARESE S) on the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA N. A. on 06/16/2017 for the principal amount of $2,854.20 and costs of $292.50 for a total of $3,146.70.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA N. A. on 06/16/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-15

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to SHARESE S MIRZAKHANYAN; On the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA N. A. on 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (TARGET NATIONAL BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (TARGET NATIONAL BANK) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (TARGET NATIONAL BANK) (Plaintiff); As to: SHARESE S MIRZAKHANYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/04/2017; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/01/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY RICK BROWN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853029. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOONE STEPHANIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE