This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 04:57:17 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N.A. VS CARRAZCO, BERNARDO

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 TD BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARRAZCO, BERNARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3834

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA N.A.

TD BANK USA N. A.

Defendant

CARRAZCO BERNARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC

BOONE STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

11/1/2018: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

10/31/2018: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/14/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/14/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice of Entry of Judgment - or Order

1/30/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment - or Order

Default Judgment

11/15/2017: Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

11/6/2017: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/6/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/6/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2017: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/27/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 10/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (SAN DIEGO); Issued by: Clerk; County: SAN DIEGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: BERNARDO CARRAZCO (Defendant); Interest: 25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: BERNARDO CARRAZCO (Defendant); Interest: 25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to BERNARDO CARRAZCO; On the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA N. A. on 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 1033; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: BERNARDO CARRAZCO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/08/2017; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 07/08/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA638681068. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOONE STEPHANIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE