This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 04:56:27 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N.A. VS BARRON, MARTHA B

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 TD BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARRON, MARTHA B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3826

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA N.A.

TD BANK USA N. A.

Defendant

BARRON MARTHA B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC

BOONE STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/18/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/29/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA N. A. on 07/24/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by (TD BANK USA N. A.) as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (TD BANK USA N. A.) (Plaintiff); As to: MARTHA B BARRON (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/05/2017; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 07/08/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA638681060. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOONE STEPHANIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE