Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 12:19:48 (UTC).

TD BANK USA N.A. VS ANGIE SANDERS

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 TD BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGIE SANDERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1942

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

SANDERS ANGIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS EMILY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/27/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TD BANK USA N.A. on 03/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by TD BANK USA N.A. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TD BANK USA N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANGIE SANDERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TD BANK USA N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANGIE SANDERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TD BANK USA N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ANGIE SANDERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less