This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2017 at 11:01:20 (UTC).

TATIANA VOZNIOUK SOLOMON VS STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 TATIANA VOZNIOUK SOLOMON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4840

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLOMON TATIANA VOZNIOUK

Defendant

STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Unknown

8/2/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Tatiana Vozniouk Solomon (Plaintiff); As to: Standard Management Company Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tatiana Vozniouk Solomon on 07/03/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Standard Management Company Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tatiana Vozniouk Solomon (Plaintiff); As to: Standard Management Company Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014773 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant