This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 00:57:01 (UTC).

TATIANA ORTIZ, ET AL. VS LOISEL NICOLET FLORES

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 TATIANA ORTIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOISEL NICOLET FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7695

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMAS AARON

ORTIZ TATIANA

Defendant

FLORES LOISEL NICOLET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

BAHARVAR GABRIELLA

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/8/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/8/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/8/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Answer - Answer

10/19/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/19/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

10/19/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

9/23/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Complaint - Complaint

9/10/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/10/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/10/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Hearing03/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Loisel Nicolet Flores (Defendant); As to: Aaron Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Loisel Nicolet Flores (Defendant); As to: Aaron Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Loisel Nicolet Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Tatiana Ortiz (Plaintiff); As to: Loisel Nicolet Flores (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/17/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tatiana Ortiz (Plaintiff); Aaron Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Loisel Nicolet Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tatiana Ortiz (Plaintiff); Aaron Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Loisel Nicolet Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tatiana Ortiz (Plaintiff); Aaron Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Loisel Nicolet Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAHARVAR GABRIELLA