This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2019 at 20:15:37 (UTC).

TARGET NATIONAL BANK VS GILBERT, CHERYL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2012 TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GILBERT, CHERYL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0065

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

GILBERT CHERYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MUREN, TARA

MUREN TARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2014
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SF COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0125.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF ACCRUED COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0058.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR CLERK'S CIVIL JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT SUBMITTED FOR JUDGMENT. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT SUBMITTED FOR JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • OSC SET 07/16/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less