This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 00:08:22 (UTC).

TAMARA OGANESYAN VS DAVID PARRA

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 TAMARA OGANESYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID PARRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1356

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OGANESYAN TAMARA

Defendant

PARRA DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALADZHYAN AYKANUSH H

Defendant Attorney

SCHNEIDER ERIC A.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss

3/4/2021: Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss this Action Pursuant...)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss this Action Pursuant...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/09/2021

8/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/09/2021

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

8/9/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Complaint - Complaint

2/10/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/10/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/10/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Tamara Oganesyan on 02/10/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(l)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/09/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Dismiss this Action (CCP section 664.6: Name Extension: this Action (CCP section 664.6; As To Parties: Tamara Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Dismiss this Action (CCP section 664.6): Name Extension changed from this Action (CCP section 664.6 to this Action (CCP section 664.6); As To Parties: Tamara Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Dismiss this Action (Pursuant to Stipulation - CCP section 664.6): Name Extension changed from this Action (CCP section 664.6) to this Action (Pursuant to Stipulation - CCP section 664.6); As To Parties: Tamara Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Dismiss this Action (Pursuant to Stipulation - CCP section 664.6): Filed By: David Parra (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss this Action Pursuant...)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 08/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Filed by: David Parra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tamara Oganesyan (Plaintiff); As to: David Parra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tamara Oganesyan (Plaintiff); As to: David Parra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tamara Oganesyan (Plaintiff); As to: David Parra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC01356 Hearing Date: August 2, 2021 Dept: 26

Oganesyan\r\nv. Parra, et al. 20STLC01356MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO STIPULATION\r\n\r\n

(CCP\r\n§ 664.6)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant David Parra’s Motion to\r\nDismiss Action is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff Tamara\r\nOganesyan (“Plaintiff”) filed the\r\ninstant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant David Parra (“Defendant”)\r\non February 10, 2020. On March 4, 2021, Defendant filed the instant Motion to\r\nDismiss Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 664.4. To date, no\r\nopposition has been filed.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Trial is set for August 9, 2021.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Discussion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Under Code of Civil Procedure, section 664.6:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

If parties to pending litigation\r\nstipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court\r\nor orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the\r\ncourt, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement.\r\nIf requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties\r\nto enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the\r\nsettlement.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

(Code Civ. Proc., § 664.6.) Prior\r\nto January 1, 2021, “parties” under section 664.6 meant the litigants\r\nthemselves, not their attorneys. (Levy\r\nv. Superior Court (1995) 10 Cal.4th 578, 586 (holding “we conclude that the\r\nterm ‘parties’ as used in section 664.6 means the litigants themselves, and\r\ndoes not include their attorneys of record.”).) Additionally, the settlement\r\nmust have included the signatures of the parties seeking to enforce the\r\nagreement, and against whom enforcement is sought. (J.B.B. Investment\r\nPartners, Ltd. v. Fair (2014) 232 Cal.App.4th 974, 985.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant has not demonstrated that the settlement agreement\r\ncomplies with the statutory requirements set forth above. (Motion, Schneider\r\nDecl., Exh. 1.) The settlement is not signed by Defendant and therefore, is not\r\nenforceable under Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Conclusion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant David Parra’s Motion to\r\nDismiss Action is DENIED without prejudice.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The court notes that this court will likely dismiss the\r\nmatter on 8-9-21 per CCP 581(b)(1) if the parties fail to appear on the date\r\nset for trial.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Court clerk to give notice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER ERIC A. ESQ.