This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 01:15:09 (UTC).

TALLA, ANDRE VS TRAN, ARTHUR

Case Summary

On 06/16/2015 TALLA, ANDRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRAN, ARTHUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4195

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TALLA ANDRE BY AND THROUGH TALLA PARTRICK MOULBE HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT

TALLA ANDRE

Defendants

TRAN ARTHUR

MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketNOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (TALLA, ANDRE) BY AND THROUGH (TALLA, PARTRICK MOULBE) HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER; NO SUCH NUMBER; UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (TALLA, ANDRE) BY AND THROUGH (TALLA, PARTRICK MOULBE) HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT . MICHAEL YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketAGREEMENT TO SETTLE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 TO ENFORCE THE FULL TERMS OF SETTLEMENT. PARTIES SETTLE THE CASE AS SET FORTH IN THE AGREEMENT TO SETTLE THE CASE DOCUMENT. ALL PARTIES ARE GIVEN COPIES OF THE SIGNED AGREEMENT IN OPEN COURT. CLERK SHALL GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC) . RECEIPT # ALH427761011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketRECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 2.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # ALH258280013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC) BY SUB-SERVING RICK AGUILAR . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH258280005. HEARING SET FOR 08/28/15 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC is a litigant