Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 10:30:44 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS ZUNIGA, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZUNIGA, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8857

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

ZUNIGA ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATENAUDE & FELIX, APC - MICHAEL D KAHN

Attorney at PATENAUDE & FELIX, APC

KAHN MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/19/17 . FOR (SYNCHRONY BANK) . AGAINST (ZUNIGA, ELIZABETH) . PRINCIPAL $ 1775.74 . ATTORNEY FEES $ .00 . INTEREST $ .00 . COSTS $ 292.50 . TOTAL $ 2,068.24 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (ZUNIGA, ELIZABETH) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ZUNIGA, ELIZABETH) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-15 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ZUNIGA, ELIZABETH) ON 11/01/16 . COSTS OF $ 67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 10/07/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR512560016. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - MICHAEL D. KAHN