Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 07:39:05 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS NARINE KARAPETYAN

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NARINE KARAPETYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3026

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

KARAPETYAN NARINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONG BORA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

2/4/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Narine Karapetyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Narine Karapetyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Narine Karapetyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Narine Karapetyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Song, Bora