This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 11:01:21 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS JONES, ROSLYN

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONES, ROSLYN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1185

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendants

JONES ROSLYNAKAJONES ROSLYN D

JONES ROSLYN AKA JONES ROSLYN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATENAUDE & FELIX, APC - MICHAEL D KAHN

Attorney at PATENAUDE & FELIX, APC

KAHN MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2017
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS RE: BANKRUPTCY FILED BY GREGAORY M. SHANFELD, ATTORNEY FOR DEBTOR . ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS STAYED AS TO (JONES, ROSLYN)AKA(JONES, ROSLYN D) ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JONES, ROSLYN)AKA(JONES, ROSLYN D) ON 11/28/16 . COSTS OF $ 67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 10/28/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR512560007. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less