This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 05:13:20 (UTC).

SYED M KALEEN VS PARKING VIOLATION

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 SYED M KALEEN filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against PARKING VIOLATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1461

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Appellant

KALEEN SYED M

Respondents

PARKING VIOLATION

CITY OF NORWALK C/O PARKING ENFORCEMENT CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

IBARRA VANESSA S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

7/24/2020: Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss; Hearing on Parking Appeal)

7/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss; Hearing on Parking Appeal)

Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

6/30/2020: Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of 06/10/2020

6/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of 06/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case)

6/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case)

Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss

6/17/2020: Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Theresa Devoy in Support of City of Norwalk's Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal

6/17/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Theresa Devoy in Support of City of Norwalk's Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Veronica Lomas in Support of City of Norwalk's Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal

6/17/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Veronica Lomas in Support of City of Norwalk's Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

6/17/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/18/2020

6/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/18/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 4/20/20)

4/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 4/20/20)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 4/20/20) of 04/13/2020

4/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 4/20/20) of 04/13/2020

Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

2/14/2020: Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

2/20/2020: Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/14/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss; Hearing on Parking Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/24/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by: City of Norwalk c/o Parking Enforcement Center (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/18/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 06/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/24/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 04/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 Not Held - Trailed was rescheduled to 06/25/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 06/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- City of Norwalk c/o Parking Enforcement Center (Respondent): Organization Name changed from Parking Violation to City of Norwalk c/o Parking Enforcement Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Parking - Citation Number: 102024151; Filed by: Syed M Kaleen (Appellant); As to: Parking Violation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Syed M Kaleen (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Syed M Kaleen (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 44 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 04/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC01461    Hearing Date: July 24, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Fri., July 24, 2020 JUDGE/DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Kaleem v. Parking Violation APPEAL FILED: 02-14-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC01461

NOTICE: OK

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO DISMISS ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL

MOVING PARTY: Respondent Parking Violation/City of Norwalk

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO DISMISS ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL

(Veh. Code, § 40230)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Respondent’s Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal is GRANTED.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of July 22, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of July 22, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On February 14, 2020, Appellant Syed M. Kaleem (“Appellant”) filed a Notice of Appeal against Respondent Parking Violation (“Respondent”) for a citation issued on August 8, 2019. (Admin. Appeal, Exh. A.)

On June 17, 2020, Respondent filed the instant Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal in Accordance with Vehicle Code section 40230 (the “Motion”). Respondent argues that Citation No. 102024151 was issued to Liza Palacios, not Respondent, and because Appellant proceeded with an appeal of a citation that was not issued to him, the administrative appeal should be dismissed. (Mot., p. 2:12-26.) Appellant did not file an opposition.

The handwritten citation number on the Notice of Appeal is somewhat blurry and could be either Citation No. 102024151 or No. 102024157. (Admin Appeal, p. 1.) However, the Court finds that this appeal pertains to the latter because Appellant attached a copy of the administrative review decision for Citation No. 102024157. (Id.) Notably, this is the same citation Appellant appeals in Kaleem v. City of Norwalk Parking Enforcement Center, LASC Case No. 20STLC00449, also scheduled to be heard on July 24, 2020. The difference in the two appeals appears to be that for Case No. 20STLC00449, Appellant attached a copy of the administrative hearing decision dated November 15, 2019, while in this appeal, Appellant attached a copy of the administrative review decision, dated August 31, 2019.

As this is a duplicative filing, and the matter is being disposed of under Case No. 20STLC00449, the instant appeal is DISMISSED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Respondent Parking Violation’s Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.