This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 04:14:40 (UTC).

SYED M. KALEEN VS PARKING VIOLATION

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 SYED M KALEEN filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against PARKING VIOLATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1455

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Appellant

KALEEN SYED M.

Respondents

PARKING VIOLATION

CITY OF NORWALK C/O PARKING ENFORCEMENT CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

IBARRA VANESSA S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)

7/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)

Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

7/24/2020: Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Veronica Lomas in Support of City of Norwalk's Motion to Dismiss

6/4/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Veronica Lomas in Support of City of Norwalk's Motion to Dismiss

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

6/4/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss

6/4/2020: Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Theresa Devoy in Support of City of Norwalk's Motion to Dismiss

6/4/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Theresa Devoy in Support of City of Norwalk's Motion to Dismiss

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/18/2020

6/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/18/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of 06/10/2020

6/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of 06/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case)

6/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set for 4/17/20)

4/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set for 4/17/20)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set for 4/17/20) of 04/13/2020

4/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set for 4/17/20) of 04/13/2020

Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

2/14/2020: Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

2/20/2020: Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/14/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/24/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/18/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 06/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/24/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 25 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 04/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 Not Held - Trailed was rescheduled to 06/24/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 06/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- City of Norwalk c/o Parking Enforcement Center (Respondent): Organization Name changed from Parking Violation to City of Norwalk c/o Parking Enforcement Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Parking - Citation Number: 102028803; Filed by: Syed M. Kaleen (Appellant); As to: Parking Violation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Syed M. Kaleen (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Syed M. Kaleen (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 44 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 04/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC01455    Hearing Date: July 24, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Fri., July 24, 2020 JUDGE/DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Kaleem v. Parking Violation APPEAL FILED: 02-14-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC01455

NOTICE: OK

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO DISMISS ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL

MOVING PARTY: Respondent Parking Violation

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO DISMISS ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL

(Veh. Code, § 40230)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Respondent Parking Violation’s Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal is GRANTED.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of July 23, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of July 23, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On February 14, 2020, Appellant Syed M. Kaleem (“Appellant”) filed a Notice of Appeal against Respondent Parking Violation (“Respondent”) for Citation No. 102028803 issued on August 4, 2019 for parking on a front or side yard. (Admin. Appeal, Exh. A.) After an administrative hearing was conducted on November 12, 2019, Appellant was found liable for the citation. (RJN, Exh. B.) The notice of administrative hearing decision, dated November 15, 2019, states in pertinent part:

“If you do wish to further contest the citation, you may appeal this decision to the Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Your request must be postmarked within 30 days from the date on this notice and include payment in the amount of $25 for the Court filing fee…If you fail to either contest the citation or pay the Court filing fee within the required period of time, you will forfeit your right to further contest the citation.” (Id.)

On June 4, 2020, Respondent filed the instant Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal in Accordance with Vehicle Code section 40230 (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Request for Judicial Notice

Respondent requests judicial notice of (1) Administrative Citation, Citation No. 102028803, and (2) Administrative Hearing Decision for Citation No. 102028803. (RJN, p. 1, Exhs. A, B.) Respondent’s request is GRANTED. (Evid. Code, § 452, subd. (c).)

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

Vehicle Code section 40230 provides that, within 30 calendar days after mailing or personal delivery of an administrative hearing decision, the contestant may seek review by filing an appeal with the superior court. (Veh. Code, § 40230, subd. (a).) If the administrative hearing decision was mailed, then the 30-day period is increased by five (5) days under Code of Civil Procedure section 1013. (Id.) The contestant must serve a copy of the notice of appeal in person or by first-class mail on the processing agency. (Id.) If no notice of appeal is filed within the 30-day period, the decision is deemed final. (Veh. Code, § 40230, subd. (d).)

Respondent argues this appeal should be dismissed because the administrative decision is now final and the Court has no jurisdiction to hear the appeal. (Mot., p. 2:27-3:6.) The Court agrees.

The notice of administrative hearing decision was mailed to Appellant on November 15, 2019 via regular mail. (Id., Lomas Decl., ¶ 7; RJN, Exh. B.) Thus, Appellant had until December 20, 2019 to file an appeal, but did not do so. Appellant asks that the Court grant him an extension of 30 days because he only obtained all relevant information as to how to file an appeal on January 20, 2020, and that Respondent should be “ordered to correct the misleading and incomplete information on ‘how to file appeal notice.’” (Admin. Appeal., p. 3.) However, the administrative hearing decision clearly directs the recipient to mail his appeal to the Stanley Mosk Courthouse, 111 N. Hill St., Room 102, Los Angeles, CA 90012 and include a $25.00 filing fee. (RJN, Exh. B.)

As Appellant failed to timely file his appeal, the administrative hearing decision is now deemed final.

Respondent’s Motion is GRANTED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Respondent Parking Violation’s Motion to Dismiss Administrative Appeal is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.