This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2020 at 08:15:36 (UTC).

SYDNEY RENEE SMITH VS DANIEL LEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 SYDNEY RENEE SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3455

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH SYDNEY RENEE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

YOUNG HALEY

LEE DANIEL

FORTUNY-DEHAENEN JENNIFER LYNN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

FORTUNY-DEHAENEN JENNIFER LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOGHADDAMI ALI R.

Defendant Attorneys

BEEBE JOHN

MARKARIAN LOUISA

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

7/8/2020: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

7/8/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/8/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

7/8/2020: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/8/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

6/30/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

6/30/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/30/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/20/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]

5/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]

Complaint - Complaint

4/20/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JENNIFER LYNN FORTUNY-DEHAENEN (Defendant); As to: SYDNEY RENEE SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: JENNIFER LYNN FORTUNY-DEHAENEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JENNIFER LYNN FORTUNY-DEHAENEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: JENNIFER LYNN FORTUNY-DEHAENEN (Defendant); As to: SYDNEY RENEE SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JENNIFER LYNN FORTUNY-DEHAENEN (Defendant); As to: SYDNEY RENEE SMITH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: DANIEL LEE (Defendant); HALEY YOUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: DANIEL LEE (Defendant); HALEY YOUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: DANIEL LEE (Defendant); HALEY YOUNG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Standing Order: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SYDNEY RENEE SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL LEE (Defendant); HALEY YOUNG (Defendant); JENNIFER LYNN FORTUNY-DEHAENEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SYDNEY RENEE SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL LEE (Defendant); HALEY YOUNG (Defendant); JENNIFER LYNN FORTUNY-DEHAENEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SYDNEY RENEE SMITH (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL LEE (Defendant); HALEY YOUNG (Defendant); JENNIFER LYNN FORTUNY-DEHAENEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOGHADDAMI ALI R.