This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 21:21:37 (UTC).

SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC VS REICH, TERESA

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REICH, TERESA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2955

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER LLC

Defendants

REICH TERESA

CASTRO FRANCISCO

HARVEY GAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS J.

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

5/4/2018: Writ - Return

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

7/24/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

RETURNED MAIL

7/24/2017: RETURNED MAIL

Application for Writ of Possession

7/24/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/24/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/24/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

7/24/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

7/24/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Hearing scheduled for 12/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department S13 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: GAIL HARVEY (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/01/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: FRANCISCO CASTRO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/01/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; TERESA REICH (Defendant); FRANCISCO CASTRO (Defendant); GAIL HARVEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Default entered as to TERESA REICH; FRANCISCO CASTRO; GAIL HARVEY; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) on 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) against Defendant (REICH, TERESA), Defendant (HARVEY, GAIL) and Defendant (CASTRO, FRANCISCO) on the Complaint filed by (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) on 06/28/2017 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 2666 E. JEFFERSON STREET, CARSON, CA 90810 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 108.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: GAIL HARVEY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: TERESA REICH (Defendant); Service Date: 06/30/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (SWAY 2014-1 BORROWER, LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 06/30/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PRD. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 12/26/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT S13 . .

    Read MoreRead Less