This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2018 at 08:24:45 (UTC).

SWAIN, SHARON DOLORES VS BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATE. L.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2016 SWAIN, SHARON DOLORES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATE L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2738

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWAIN SHARON DOLORES

Defendants

BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATE. L.L.C. DBA ROSE VILA HEALTHCARE CENTER

BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATE. L. L. C. DBA ROSE VILA HEALTHCARE CENTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/18/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by SHARON DOLORES SWAIN on 08/25/2016 (from DOW16D02738): Defendant (BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATE. L. L. C.) DBA (ROSE VILA HEALTHCARE CENTER) does not owe the plaintiff (SWAIN, SHARON DOLORES) any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: The court writes a statement of decision. A copy is incorporated by reference herein and mailed to each party. Exhibits to custodian.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Other - statement of decision; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 11/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2016 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Address for (BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATE. L. L. C.) (Defendant) amendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: SHARON DOLORES SWAIN (Plaintiff); As to: (BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATE. L. L. C.) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/25/2016 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2016 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: SHARON DOLORES SWAIN (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SE2 RE: SCFD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1160317E6774. HEARING SET FOR 06/13/16 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELL VILLA CARE ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant