Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 06:41:26 (UTC).

SUZANNA MALAMUD VS MARTIN ANGELES

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 SUZANNA MALAMUD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTIN ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0051

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALAMUD SUZANNA

Defendant

ANGELES MARTIN

Palmdale, CA 93550

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS PAUL

Attorney at Dennis P Block & Associates

5437 Laurel Canyon Blvd 2Fl,

Valley Village, CA 91607

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

11/13/2017: Writ - Return

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

10/6/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017

9/19/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/4/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Martin Angeles)

8/4/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Martin Angeles)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/3/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

8/3/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

8/17/2017: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Answer

8/7/2017: Answer

Complaint

8/3/2017: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

8/3/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/7/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Application for Writ of Possession

9/28/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

8/17/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Suzanna Malamud (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 46.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 09/19/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Martin Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A22 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 01/30/2018 08:30 AM at 01/30/2018 8:30 AM OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service in Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Suzanna Malamud (Plaintiff); As to: Martin Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Suzanna Malamud (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.