This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2017 at 17:49:03 (UTC).

SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER VS GRAVES, CLARA

Case Summary

On 02/04/2016 SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRAVES, CLARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0835

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER

Defendants

GRAVES CLARA AN INDIVIDUAL

GRAVES CLARA

Assignee

PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

BLUNDO FRANK GEORGE JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk; As to: CLARA GRAVES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: AH-2016-0003606 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (GRAVES, CLARA) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER) . DAHLIA JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:09A M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. MICHAEL SMALL, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/28/16 . FOR (SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER) . AGAINST (GRAVES, CLARA) AN INDIVIDUAL . PRINCIPAL $ 3600.00 . COSTS $ 102.89 . TOTAL $ 3702.89 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GRAVES, CLARA) AN INDIVIDUAL BY SUB-SERVING JOANIE GRAVES . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/28/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 COSTS OF $ 52.89 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH427761004. HEARING SET FOR 04/28/16 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE A CORPORATION is a litigant