This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 10:56:05 (UTC).

SUN & STARS LIGHTING INC VS ALL STAR WHOLESALE ELECTRIC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2016 SUN STARS LIGHTING INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL STAR WHOLESALE ELECTRIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2518

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN & STARS LIGHTING INC

Defendants

ALL STAR ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC

ALL STAR WHOLESALE ELECTRIC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/18/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Other - (name extension) - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

10/20/2016: Other - (name extension) - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/20/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

10/20/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/13/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/13/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 10/20/2016

10/20/2016: Minute Order of 10/20/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/20/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 10/20/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/20/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 10/20/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: SUN & STARS LIGHTING INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Other - Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: SUN & STARS LIGHTING INC (Plaintiff); ALL STAR WHOLESALE ELECTRIC (Defendant); ALL STAR ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from ALL STAR ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC (Defendant), ALL STAR WHOLESALE ELECTRIC (Defendant) to ALL STAR ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: SUN & STARS LIGHTING INC (Plaintiff); As to: ALL STAR WHOLESALE ELECTRIC (Defendant); ALL STAR ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC (Defendant); Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: SUN & STARS LIGHTING INC (Plaintiff); As to: ALL STAR WHOLESALE ELECTRIC (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0003346 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/20/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: SUN & STARS LIGHTING INC (Plaintiff); As to: ALL STAR WHOLESALE ELECTRIC (Defendant); ALL STAR ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN & STARS LIGHTING INC. is a litigant