This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 00:28:20 (UTC).

STUDIO LUX, LLC VS PHILLIP D. LEE

Case Summary

On 12/07/2017 STUDIO LUX, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PHILLIP D LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4942

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUDIO LUX LLC

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

LEE DAVID Y.

KIM CYNTHIA

LEE BRIAN DBA JAMISON SERVICES INC.

KIM PAUL T.

LEE PHILLIP D.

JAMISON SERVICES INC

LEE BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMPSON PATRICK SHAUN

STRAIN DONNA M.

Defendant Attorney

OSTROSKY GWENDOLYN MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/3/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Judicial Notice

4/3/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/3/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - by Mail

3/14/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - by Mail

Notice of Ruling

3/14/2018: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/8/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Reply (name extension)

3/6/2018: Reply (name extension)

Reply (name extension) - Memorandum in Support of Motions to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; etc.

3/6/2018: Reply (name extension) - Memorandum in Support of Motions to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; etc.

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Studio Lux, LLC on 12/07/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Studio Lux, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Studio Lux, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of unavailability of counsel; Filed by: Studio Lux, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jamison Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 05/14/2018; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of courtcall appearance; Filed by: Studio Lux, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketOpposition to demurrer by defendant; Filed by: Studio Lux, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Studio Lux, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Lee (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Studio Lux, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: David Y. Lee (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Studio Lux, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Phillip D. Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Studio Lux, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMISON SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thompson, Patrick Shaun