Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:47:49 (UTC).

STRINGFELLOW, RONNELL VS 2207 LINCOLN BELL LLC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 STRINGFELLOW, RONNELL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against 2207 LINCOLN BELL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3937

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRINGFELLOW RONNELL

Defendants

RAND 2207 LINCOLN BELL LLC

2207 LINCOLN BELL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MORSE MEHRBAN A P C

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

10/2/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - .

10/2/2017: Declaration (name extension) - .

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/27/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

12/28/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: RONNELL STRINGFELLOW (Plaintiff); As to: 2207 LINCOLN BELL LLC (Defendant); RAND 2207 LINCOLN BELL LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketAddress for LAW OFFICES OF MORSE MEHRBAN A P C (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- RONNELL STRINGFELLOW (Plaintiff): Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF MORSE MEHRBAN A P C (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 10/05/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/29/2017 to 10/05/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: RONNELL STRINGFELLOW (Plaintiff); As to: 2207 LINCOLN BELL LLC (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration . Filed by: RONNELL STRINGFELLOW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketABSTRACT ISSUED. ATTY SERVICE. MB ABSTRACT ISSUED. ATTY SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketCASE SUMMARY AND DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT FILED CASE SUMMARY AND DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT FILED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/01/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 03/30/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - CIVIL RIGHTS/DISCRIMINIATION FILED Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -CASE FILING FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less