This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 04:43:02 (UTC).

STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION VS BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC , A NEW YORK CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0394

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Defendants

JENSEN KRISTEN

BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC DBA BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIN PAUL A.

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/8/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/8/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/8/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve

1/7/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Minute Order, Order Granting Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment and Stipulated Judgment

2/10/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Minute Order, Order Granting Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment and Stipulated Judgment

Judgment - Judgment Proposed Judgment

2/4/2021: Judgment - Judgment Proposed Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)

Order (name extension) - Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment

2/4/2021: Order (name extension) - Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment

Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement

9/18/2020: Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

9/13/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

9/13/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: KRISTEN JENSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Minute Order, Order Granting Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment and Stipulated Judgment; Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC (Defendant); KRISTEN JENSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation against Defendant KRISTEN JENSEN and Defendant BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC DBA BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY on the Complaint filed by STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation on 11/08/2019 for damages of $10,819.00 for a total of $10,819.00, joint and several.; Other: Interest at the rate of 10% per annum.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketJudgment Proposed Judgment; Signed and Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC (Defendant); KRISTEN JENSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketOrder Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment; Signed and Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 02/04/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: KRISTEN JENSEN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/16/2020; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve; Signed and Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC (Defendant); KRISTEN JENSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC (Defendant); KRISTEN JENSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC (Defendant); KRISTEN JENSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., a New York corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BEACON BEHAVIOR THERAPY INC (Defendant); KRISTEN JENSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC10394    Hearing Date: February 04, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., February 4, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Strategic Funding Source, Inc. v. Beacon Behavior Therapy, Inc., et al.

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC10394 COMP. FILED: 11-08-19

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O: 04-07-21

DISC. MOT. C/O: 04-22-21

TRIAL DATE: 05-07-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO ENTER STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc.

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

(CCP § 664.6)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc.’s Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment in Enforcement of Settlement is GRANTED. Judgment to be entered in the amount of $10,819.00 plus interest against Defendants Beacon Behavior Therapy, Inc. dba Beacon Behavior Therapy and Kristen Jensen.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of February 2, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of February 2, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On November 8, 2019, Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract and breach of guaranty against Defendants Beacon Behavior Therapy, Inc. dba Beacon Behavior Therapy (“Beacon”) and Kristen Jensen (“Jensen”) (collectively, “Defendants”). Plaintiff filed proofs of service demonstrating Defendants were served with the Summons and Complaint via substitute service on January 14, 2020. (1/30/20 Proofs of Service.)

On September 18, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment in Enforcement of Settlement (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

Under Code of Civil Procedure, section 664.6:

(a) If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside of the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.

(b) For purposes of this section, a writing is signed by a party if it is signed by any of the following:

(1) The party.

(2) An attorney who represents the party.

(3) If the party is an insurer, an agent who is authorized in writing by the insurer to sign on the insurer's behalf.”

  1. Discussion

Plaintiff presents evidence that on February 4, 2020, the parties executed a Settlement Agreement and Release (the “Settlement Agreement”) and a Stipulation for Entry of Judgment (the (the “Stipulation”). (Mot., Wolfson Decl., ¶ 2, Exh. 1.) The Settlement Agreement provides that Plaintiff would be paid a total of $13,944.00 at a rate of $200.00 every Friday beginning February 7, 2020 until paid in full. (Id.) If Defendants defaulted, Plaintiff was required to provide them with written notice of default. (Id.) If Defendants failed to cure the default within five days, Plaintiff could seek entry of judgment of $13,944.00 less any payments received plus all reasonable attorney’s fees and costs incurred in enforcing the Settlement Agreement against Defendants. (Id.) The Settlement Agreement also provides that interest of 10% per annum shall accrue on all scheduled but unpaid payments. (Id.)

Defendants made payments of $3,125.00 but defaulted. (Mot., Gibbs Decl., ¶ 3, Exh. 3.) Plaintiff sent Defendants a notice of default on July 23, 2020, but the default was not remedied. (Mot., Gibbs Decl., ¶ 3.) Defendants’ current balance is $10,819.00. (Id., Wolfson Mot., ¶ 4, Exh. 2.)

The Court finds the Settlement Agreement and the Stipulation, signed by the parties, to be valid and enforceable under Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6 Plaintiff requests that a judgment against Defendants be entered in the amount of $10,819.00 plus interest. (Mot., p. 2:22-24.)

Plaintiff’s Motion is GRANTED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Strategic Funding Source, Inc.’s Motion to Enter Stipulated Judgment in Enforcement of Settlement is GRANTED. Judgment to be entered in the amount of $10,819.00 plus interest against Defendants Beacon Behavior Therapy, Inc. dba Beacon Behavior Therapy and Kristen Jensen.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE INC. DBA SODA SODA DISTRIBUTING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levin, Paul A