Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 06:32:12 (UTC).

STRATEGIC ACQUISITION INC. VS GARNER, MONISHA

Case Summary

On 04/18/2012 STRATEGIC ACQUISITION INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARNER, MONISHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0340

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRATEGIC ACQUISITION INC.

Defendant

GARNER MONISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRENK, JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DECLARATION OF LOST RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION AS TO POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less