Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 09:56:23 (UTC).

STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. VS LIFEPHARM, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIFEPHARM, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0257

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC.

Defendant

LIFEPHARM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/30/2018: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

8/1/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

8/1/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/1/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Stevens Global Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stevens Global Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Lifepharm, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stevens Global Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD