Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2021 at 05:21:22 (UTC).

STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. VS AEQUITAS PACKING GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AEQUITAS PACKING GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6248

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC.

Defendant

AEQUITAS PACKING GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

7/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Stevens Global Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Aequitas Packing Group, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/19/2020; Service Cost: 410.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stevens Global Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stevens Global Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Aequitas Packing Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stevens Global Logistics, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Aequitas Packing Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD