Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 00:01:14 (UTC).

STEVEN L SZOCS VS DAISY TANYA BLANCAS

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 STEVEN L SZOCS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAISY TANYA BLANCAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1589

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SZOCS STEVEN L

Defendant

BLANCAS DAISY TANYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZOCS STEVEN L

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/7/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

11/27/2018: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

12/6/2018: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

12/10/2018: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Other - (name extension) - Other - proof of service: conformed copy- entry of default

12/24/2018: Other - (name extension) - Other - proof of service: conformed copy- entry of default

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment amended declaration

12/24/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment amended declaration

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/24/2018 entered for Plaintiff Steven L Szocs against Defendant Daisy Tanya Blancas.

12/24/2018: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/24/2018 entered for Plaintiff Steven L Szocs against Defendant Daisy Tanya Blancas.

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

12/24/2018: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

9/10/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

9/10/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/10/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/24/2018 entered for Plaintiff Steven L Szocs against Defendant Daisy Tanya Blancas. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Steven L Szocs against Defendant Daisy Tanya Blancas on the Complaint filed by Steven L Szocs on 09/10/2018 for damages of $14,950.00 and costs of $410.00 for a total of $15,360.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment amended declaration; Filed by: Steven L Szocs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Steven L Szocs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketOther - proof of service: conformed copy- entry of default; Filed by: Steven L Szocs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Daisy Tanya Blancas; On the Complaint filed by Steven L Szocs on 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Steven L Szocs (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Tanya Blancas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Steven L Szocs (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Tanya Blancas (Defendant); Service Date: 09/13/18; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Steven L Szocs (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Tanya Blancas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Steven L Szocs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Szocs, Steven L