Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2019 at 01:14:42 (UTC).

STEVEN GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SOLUTION LOGISTICS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/27/2018 STEVEN GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOLUTION LOGISTICS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9161

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVEN GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

SOLUTION LOGISTICS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/11/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request (name extension) - Request Request for Continuance of Trial

12/13/2019: Request (name extension) - Request Request for Continuance of Trial

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/7/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Summons - on Complaint

6/27/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/27/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/27/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • Hearing06/30/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Hearing03/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketRequest Request for Continuance of Trial; Filed by: Steven Global Logistics, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Charge Fee ?: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/19/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Steven Global Logistics, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Solution Logistics, LLC a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Steven Global Logistics, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Steven Global Logistics, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Solution Logistics, LLC a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Steven Global Logistics, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD