This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2017 at 10:07:11 (UTC).

STEVE CARBAJAL VS WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 STEVE CARBAJAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2014

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARBAJAL STEVE

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Defendant

WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY

4270 Wilshire Boulevard,

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/25/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/25/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/25/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017

9/25/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/25/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

2/28/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/28/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/28/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/19/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 07/19/2017

7/19/2017: Minute Order of 07/19/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/02/2017

5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 09/25/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Steve Carbajal (Plaintiff); As to: Wilshire Escrow Company a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/10/2017; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Wilshire Escrow Company a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Wilshire Escrow Company a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170228E8736 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170228E8736 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Steve Carbajal (Plaintiff); As to: Wilshire Escrow Company a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY is a litigant