This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 00:47:22 (UTC).

STEPHEN KANG VS NORMA LORENA CELISGUZMAN

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 STEPHEN KANG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NORMA LORENA CELISGUZMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4070

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANG STEPHEN

Defendant

CELISGUZMAN NORMA LORENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OH HYUN

Defendant Attorney

POKLADOWSKI THOMAS D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/22/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; and SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF IBRAHIM N. MUHTASEB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

10/8/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; and SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF IBRAHIM N. MUHTASEB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/5/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/7/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

1/17/2019: Answer - Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/19/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/19/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/19/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/19/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Stephen Kang on 11/19/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Stephen Kang as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAddress for Hyun Oh (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/16/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Norma Lorena Celisguzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; and SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF IBRAHIM N. MUHTASEB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS; Filed by: Norma Lorena Celisguzman (Defendant); As to: Stephen Kang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Norma Lorena Celisguzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Stephen Kang (Plaintiff); As to: Norma Lorena Celisguzman (Defendant); Service Date: 12/17/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stephen Kang (Plaintiff); As to: Norma Lorena Celisguzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stephen Kang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC14070    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2023.010)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Norma Lorena Celis Guzman’s Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories and Request for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

On November 19, 2018, Plaintiff filed this action against Defendant for motor vehicle and general negligence arising out of car accident that occurred on June 5, 2017.

On August 7, 2019, Defendant Norma Lorena Celis Guzman (“Defendant”) served Special Interrogatories, Set One, on Plaintiff Stephan Kang (“Plaintiff”). (Muhtaseb Decl. ¶ 2, Exh. A.) To date, Plaintiff has not responded to the discovery requests. (Id. ¶¶ 4-5.) As a result, Defendant filed the instant Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on October 8, 2019.

II. Analysis & Order

Plaintiff has failed to respond to Defendant’s discovery requests. Accordingly, the unopposed Motion is GRANTED. Pursuant to CCP § 2030.290, Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, to Defendant’s Special Interrogatories within twenty (20) days of the date of Defendant’s service of a notice of this Order.

As the Motion has been granted, monetary sanctions are mandatory under CCP § 2030.290(c). Given the simplicity of the Motion and the lack of opposition and reply, the Court awards Defendant $460 ($200/hr. x 2 hrs., plus $60 filing fee) in reasonable attorney’s fees and costs as monetary sanctions against Plaintiff and his attorney of record, John H. Oh, Esq., jointly and severally. Sanctions are to be paid within thirty (30) days from the date of Defendant serving a notice of this Order on Plaintiff and his attorney.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.