This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2019 at 00:39:19 (UTC).

STATE OF CALIFORNIA - DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS VS RAAM CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 STATE OF CALIFORNIA - DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS filed an Other lawsuit against RAAM CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0610

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STATE OF CALIFORNIA - DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

Respondent

RAAM CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PAGANELLI CARL SHADI

 

Court Documents

Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

2/22/2019: Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/16/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/5/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/22/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

2/22/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: State of California - Department of Industrial Relations (Petitioner); As to: Raam Construction Inc (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State of California - Department of Industrial Relations (Petitioner); As to: Raam Construction Inc (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by: State of California - Department of Industrial Relations (Petitioner); As to: Raam Construction Inc (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Petitioner State of California - Department of Industrial Relations against Respondent Raam Construction Inc on the Petition filed by State of California - Department of Industrial Relations on 02/22/2019 for the principal amount of $6,750.00, interest of $2,006.51, and costs of $225.00 for a total of $8,981.51.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAAM CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paganelli, Carl Shadi