This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 14:22:59 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE VS MARTINEZ-CRUZ, DAVID

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARTINEZ-CRUZ, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4779

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE

Defendants

PADILLA ANTONIO

MARTINEZ-CRUZ DAVID

PADILLA STEPHANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON GOLDMAN& SCHWARZ A PROF

 

Court Documents

(name extension) - DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

4/25/2017: (name extension) - DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

(name extension) - DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

4/24/2017: (name extension) - DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/15/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/10/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Complaint - Breach of Contract

4/13/2017: Complaint - Breach of Contract

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

7/14/2017: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

12/13/2017: Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

Summons

4/13/2017: Summons

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/15/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Personal Service

8/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

4/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

7/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • Hearingat 0830 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 08/13/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- DAVID MARTINEZ-CRUZ (Defendant): Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- ANTONIO PADILLA (Defendant): Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/30/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE (Plaintiff); As to: Stephanie Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to DAVID MARTINEZ-CRUZ; On the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE on 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/15/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 04/13/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less