This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2019 at 15:22:05 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE VS BRICKMAN, DAVID

Case Summary

On 05/04/2012 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE filed an Other lawsuit against BRICKMAN, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0567

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE

Defendant

BRICKMAN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILKS, ROBERT AARON

WILKS ROBERT AARON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2013
  • UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT TO DMV-DL30 ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: TYPO CORRECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • A/C ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DELETED REASON: REQ. DOC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED BY PLAINTIFF. NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED BY PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • OSC SET 07/18/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87, RM 202 NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/31/12, IN DEPT 87 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKS ROBERT A.