This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 02:41:20 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS TIMOTHY RASSHA LEE

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TIMOTHY RASSHA LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SERENA R. MURILLO and RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7238

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

SERENA R. MURILLO

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

LEE TIMOTHY RASSHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAYLOR JORDAN D.

BENSON SUSAN M

Defendant Attorneys

VARDANYAN GEVORG S

VARDANYAN GEVORG S.

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

8/20/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Judgment - Judgment Judgment by Court After Court Trial and Proof of Service

7/19/2021: Judgment - Judgment Judgment by Court After Court Trial and Proof of Service

Affidavit (name extension) - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) as to Judge Rafael A. Ongkeko

7/8/2021: Affidavit (name extension) - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) as to Judge Rafael A. Ongkeko

Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order - Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order to Judge Ongkeko, Dept. D, Santa Monica, OTR today at 11:00 a.m.

7/8/2021: Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order - Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order to Judge Ongkeko, Dept. D, Santa Monica, OTR today at 11:00 a.m.

Jury Question - Jury Question 11:55 AM

7/9/2021: Jury Question - Jury Question 11:55 AM

Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions Withdrawn

7/9/2021: Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions Withdrawn

Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions Given

7/9/2021: Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions Given

Special Verdict - Special Verdict

7/12/2021: Special Verdict - Special Verdict

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial;)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial;)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

7/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

7/9/2021: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions

7/1/2021: Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

7/1/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Witness List - Witness List

7/1/2021: Witness List - Witness List

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

7/1/2021: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

4/21/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED THE TRUTH OF MATTERS; DECLARATION OF GEVORG VARDANYAN

5/7/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED THE TRUTH OF MATTERS; DECLARATION OF GEVORG VARDANYAN

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Timothy Rassha Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against Defendant Timothy Rassha Lee on the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 08/06/2019 for damages of $19,352.08, interest of $2,689.75, and costs of $592.75 for a total of $22,634.58.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment by Court After Court Trial and Proof of Service: Status Date changed from 07/19/2021 to 07/19/2021; Name Extension changed from Judgment by Court After Court Trial and Proof of Service to by Court After Court Trial and Proof of Service; Result Date changed from 07/19/2021 to 07/19/2021; As To Parties changed from Timothy Rassha Lee (Defendant) to Timothy Rassha Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Judgment by Court After Court Trial and Proof of Service: Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSpecial Verdict; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketJury Question 11:55 AM; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketJury Instructions Given; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketJury Instructions Withdrawn; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Timothy Rassha Lee (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/02/2019; Service Cost: 75.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Timothy Rassha Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Timothy Rassha Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Timothy Rassha Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC07238    Hearing Date: May 20, 2021    Dept: 26

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Timothy Rassha Lee is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Timothy Rassha Lee is GRANTED..

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR JORDAN D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M