This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 04:48:22 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS TIFFANY CELESTE CHARROUX

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TIFFANY CELESTE CHARROUX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2804

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CHARROUX TIFFANY CELESTE

CHARROUX TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAHFOUZ RICHARD LOUIS II

LAURIE JOHN

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIOTT KELLY

LAW YUK

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Settlement

2/19/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Settlement

Order (name extension) - Order Proposed Order

2/19/2021: Order (name extension) - Order Proposed Order

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/26/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/31/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/08/2019

11/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/08/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/08/2019

11/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/08/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate) of 11/13/2019

11/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate) of 11/13/2019

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/23/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition

9/23/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition

Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

8/29/2019: Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

7/15/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Complaint - Complaint

4/11/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

10/15/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

10/15/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/15/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Settlement: Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Proposed Order: Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 04/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY as to TIFFANY CHARROUX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 10/15/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2250399 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 04/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 26 - Hon. Upinder S. Kalra; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tiffany Celeste Charroux (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/04/2019; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tiffany Celeste Charroux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 04/11/2019 to 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC12804    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 94

State Farm v. Charroux, et al.

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

(CCP § 1048)

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendant Tiffany Charroux’s Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED. THE INSTANT ACTION, STATE FARM V. CHARROUX, LASC CASE NO. 18STLC12804 IS DEEMED THE LEAD CASE AND ALL FUTURE FILINGS ARE TO BE UNDER THE LEAD CASE NUMBER. ALL FUTURE DATES IN THE SECOND SUBROGATION ACTION, CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY V. CHARROUX, LASC CASE NO. 19STLC03590, ARE VACATED.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for automobile subrogation against Defendant Tiffany Charroux (“Defendant”) on October 15, 2018. Following her Answer, Defendant filed the instant Motion to Consolidate on August 29, 2019. Defendant moves to consolidate the instant action with California Automobile Insurance Company v. Charroux, LASC Case No. 19STLC03590 (“the second subrogation action”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

I. Legal Standard

Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.350, subdivision (a) states in relevant part:

(1) A notice of motion to consolidate must:

(A) List all named parties in each case, the names of those who have appeared, and the names of their respective attorneys of record;

(B) Contain the captions of all the cases sought to be consolidated, with the lowest numbered case shown first; and

(C) Be filed in each case sought to be consolidated.

(2) The motion to consolidate:

(A) Is deemed a single motion for the purpose of determining the appropriate filing fee, but memorandums, declarations, and other supporting papers must be filed only in the lowest numbered case;

(B) Must be served on all attorneys of record and all non-represented parties in all of the cases sought to be consolidated; and

(C) Must have a proof of service filed as part of the motion.

(Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.350, subd. (a). Also, the consolidation statute, Code of Civil Procedure section 1048, states in relevant part:

(a) When actions involving a common question of law or fact are pending before the court, it may order a joint hearing or trial of any or all the matters in issue in the actions; it may order all the actions consolidated and it may make such orders concerning proceedings therein as may tend to avoid unnecessary costs or delay.

(b) The court, in furtherance of convenience or to avoid prejudice, or when separate trials will be conducive to expedition and economy, may order a separate trial of any cause of action, including a cause of action asserted in a cross-complaint, or of any separate issue or of any number of causes of action or issues, preserving the right of trial by jury required by the Constitution or a statute of this state or of the United States.

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048, subd. (a).) The granting or denial of the motion to consolidate rests in the sound discretion of the trial court, and will not be reversed except upon a clear showing of abuse of discretion. (See Fellner v. Steinbaum (1955) 132 Cal.App.2d 509, 511.)

II. Discussion

Defendant moves to consolidate this action with the second subrogation action on the grounds that both cases arise out of the same set of operative facts, and therefore require resolution of common questions of law and fact. The notice of the Motion to Consolidate complies with Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.350, subdivision (a)(1) and is filed in both cases. The proof of service also demonstrates compliance with Cal. Rules of Court Rule 3.350, subdivision (a)(2). Furthermore, the Motion to Consolidate it properly brought with respect to cases in the same department. Both the instant action and the second subrogation action are assigned to Department 94 of the Los Angeles Superior Court.

Finally, both actions arise out of the same incident, namely the automobile accident involving Defendant that occurred on April 22, 2016 at and about N. Avenue 50, in the City of Los Angeles. (Compl., ¶10; Second Subrogation Action Compl., ¶4.) Both actions will require resolution of common questions of law and fact pertaining to the liability of the drivers involved in that accident, including Defendant.

Based on the foregoing, the Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED. THE INSTANT ACTION, STATE FARM V. CHARROUX, LASC CASE NO. 18STLC12804 IS DEEMED THE LEAD CASE AND ALL FUTURE FILINGS ARE TO BE UNDER THE LEAD CASE NUMBER. ALL FUTURE DATES IN THE SECOND SUBROGATION ACTION ARE VACATED.

Court clerk to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAURIE JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.