This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 11:09:57 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS TANESHA EDMOND, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY against TANESHA EDMOND in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0911

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

USHER DEVON

EDMOND TANESHA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

8/24/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

8/24/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/24/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Devon Usher (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/19/18; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tanesha Edmond (Defendant); Devon Usher (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC10911    Hearing Date: February 20, 2020    Dept: 25

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.10, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant’s Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On August 22, 2018, Plaintiff YMPK Law Group (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for intentional interference with prospective economic advantage and negligent interference with prospective economic advantage against Defendants Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. (“Ameriprise”) and Kuzyk Law, LLP (“Kuzyk”). Defendant Kuzyk was dismissed from the action on September 30, 2019.

On September 17, 2019, Defendant Ameriprise filed the instant Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Entire Complaint (the “Demurrer”). On October 7, 2019, Plaintiff filed an Opposition and on October 17, 2019, Ameriprise filed a Reply.

On October 22, 2019, the Court continued the hearing on the Demurrer because Ameriprise failed to include a meet and confer declaration with its Motion as required by Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41. (10/22/19 Minute Order.) Ameriprise was ordered to meet and confer with Plaintiff and file declaration attesting to such efforts no later than January 23, 2019. (Id.)

To date, Ameriprise has not filed the requested declaration. As such, the Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant’s Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.