This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 07:03:38 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS STEPHANIE MATA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEPHANIE MATA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4902

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MATA STEPHANIE

PALACIOS OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

PLEASANT JOSEPH M.

BURGOS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/31/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING

8/31/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Dee...)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Dee...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/12/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/8/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

7/8/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

7/8/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/6/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

7/6/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ ISO MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

12/28/2020: Answer - Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/26/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

6/11/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/11/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/11/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Deeming Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, Set One, Served on Defendant Oscar Palacios - Admitted; Request for Monetary Sanctions Against the Defendant scheduled for 09/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice OF HEARING; Filed by: STEPHANIE MATA (Defendant); OSCAR PALACIOS (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: STEPHANIE MATA (Defendant); OSCAR PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Dee...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Deeming Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, Set One, Served on Defendant Oscar Palacios - Admitted; Request for Monetary Sanctions Against the Defendant scheduled for 08/25/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/30/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Deeming Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, Set One, Served on Defendant Oscar Palacios - Admitted; Request for Monetary Sanctions Against the Defendant scheduled for 08/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/25/2021 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for an Order to Deem Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, Set One, Served on Defendant Oscar Palacios - Admitted; Request for Monetary Sanctions Against the Defendant: Exact Name: Motion for an Order to Deem Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, Set One, Served on Defendant Oscar Palacios - Admitted; Request for Monetary Sanctions Against the Defendant; As To Parties changed from OSCAR PALACIOS (Defendant) to OSCAR PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAddress for Richard Burgos (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHANIE MATA (Defendant); Service Date: 06/26/2020; Service Cost: 89.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHANIE MATA (Defendant); OSCAR PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHANIE MATA (Defendant); OSCAR PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHANIE MATA (Defendant); OSCAR PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHANIE MATA (Defendant); OSCAR PALACIOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC04902 Hearing Date: August 25, 2021 Dept: 26

State Farm v. Mata, et al. 20STLC04902

MOTION\r\nTO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

(CCP\r\n§§ 2033.280, 2023.010)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s\r\nMotion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions Against\r\nDefendant Oscar Palacios is GRANTED. DEFENDANT OSCAR PALACIOS IS ORDERED TO PAY\r\nSANCTIONS OF $160.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS\r\nORDER.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s\r\nMotion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions Against\r\nDefendant Stephanie Mata is GRANTED. DEFENDANT STEPHANIE MATA IS ORDERED TO PAY\r\nSANCTIONS OF $160.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS\r\nORDER.

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On February 4, 2021, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile\r\nInsurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendants\r\nStephanie Mata and Oscar Palacios (“Defendants”). (Motions, Pleasant Decl., Exh. A.) Plaintiff filed the instant\r\nMotions to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted (“the Motion”) on July 6 and 8,\r\n2021. No opposition has been filed to date.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort\r\nbefore a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc.,\r\n§ 2033.280.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding\r\nparty fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Despite a\r\nmeet and confer effort, Plaintiff did not receive any responses to the\r\ndiscovery requests from Defendants as of the filing of these Motions. (Motions,\r\nPleasant Decl., at ¶¶2-4 and Exh. B.) Nor have Defendants filed oppositions to\r\nthe Motions.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

In light of Defendants’ failure to serve responses,\r\nPlaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission admitted. (Code\r\nCiv. Proc., § 2033.280.) Additionally, sanctions are required pursuant to Code\r\nof Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been\r\nproperly noticed. Sanctions are granted against each Defendant in the amount of\r\n$160.00, based half-an-hour of attorney time billed at $200.00 per hour, plus\r\nthe $60.00 filing fee. (Motions, Pleasant Decl., ¶5.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Conclusion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s\r\nMotion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions Against\r\nDefendant Oscar Palacios is GRANTED. DEFENDANT OSCAR PALACIOS IS ORDERED TO PAY\r\nSANCTIONS OF $160.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS\r\nORDER.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s\r\nMotion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions Against\r\nDefendant Stephanie Mata is GRANTED. DEFENDANT STEPHANIE MATA IS ORDERED TO PAY\r\nSANCTIONS OF $160.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS\r\nORDER.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party to give notice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT