This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 06:39:24 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS SONIA MUNOZ ROMERO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SONIA MUNOZ ROMERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6372

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ROMERO BRANDON

MUNOZ ROMERO SONIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENCHEL ROBIN F

Defendant Attorney

REPCHAIN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/30/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

10/5/2020: Answer - Answer

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/18/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

12/18/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Application (name extension) - Application Application to Set Aside Dismissal and For Entry of Judgment in the Amount of 10,926.71

9/3/2021: Application (name extension) - Application Application to Set Aside Dismissal and For Entry of Judgment in the Amount of 10,926.71

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order

8/24/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order

Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - Stipulation and Order for Settlement and Dismissal pursuant to CCP 664.6

7/29/2021: Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - Stipulation and Order for Settlement and Dismissal pursuant to CCP 664.6

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

7/29/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/11/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]

Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

3/4/2021: Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketApplication Application to Set Aside Dismissal and For Entry of Judgment in the Amount of 10,926.71; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Brandon Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Brandon Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 07/30/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order for Settlement and Dismissal pursuant to CCP 664.6: Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAddress for Robin F Genchel (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 07/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Sonia Munoz Romero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 02/16/2021 to 03/04/2021; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Brandon Romero (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/10/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Munoz Romero (Defendant); Service Date: 08/06/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Munoz Romero (Defendant); Brandon Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Munoz Romero (Defendant); Brandon Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Munoz Romero (Defendant); Brandon Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENCHEL ROBIN F