Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2020 at 17:46:52 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS SHOMAN KASBEKAR

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SHOMAN KASBEKAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2999

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

KASBEKAR SHOMAN

Cross Defendant

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MAHFOUZ RICHARD LOUIS II

Defendant Attorney

FENECH JOSEPH M

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice of association of counsel

12/10/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of association of counsel

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application For an Order Shortening Time to Immediately Hear Its Motion To Continue Trial or, Alternatively, Specially Setting Said Motion; Memorandum

12/12/2019: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application For an Order Shortening Time to Immediately Hear Its Motion To Continue Trial or, Alternatively, Specially Setting Said Motion; Memorandum

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/18/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Koeller, Nebeker Carlson & Haluck's Ex Parte Application for an Order to Specially Set the Hearing of Its Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/23/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Koeller, Nebeker Carlson & Haluck's Ex Parte Application for an Order to Specially Set the Hearing of Its Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/11/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/12/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/12/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/29/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Rachel R. Ostrander

4/30/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Rachel R. Ostrander

Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/30/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application to Vacate The Currently Set Bench Trial And Set the Case for a Jury Trial

5/3/2019: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application to Vacate The Currently Set Bench Trial And Set the Case for a Jury Trial

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Vacate The Currently Set B...)

5/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Vacate The Currently Set B...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Vacate The Currently Set B...) of 05/07/2019

5/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Vacate The Currently Set B...) of 05/07/2019

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

5/29/2019: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/18/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • Hearing01/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Hearing09/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/10/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/12/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered; As To Parties changed from Shoman Kasbekar (Defendant) to Shoman Kasbekar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1977981 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketAddress for Richard Louis Mahfouz, II (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Shoman Kasbekar (Defendant); Service Date: 01/30/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Shoman Kasbekar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC02999    Hearing Date: September 10, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Maria K. Pleše, Esq.’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant Shoman Kasbekar is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS:

· NO PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEPTEMBER 10, 2020 HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT SHOMAN KASBEKAR.

· NO SUPPORTING DECLARATION ON FORM MC-052.

· PROPOSED ORDER ON FORM MC-053 IS INCOMPLETE.[Original hearing date of 7/17/20 was continued to 9/10/20 by the Court. While the original notice of motion was served and notice of the continued hearing date were served by the Court on the parties’ attorneys, no proof of service of the continued hearing date on Defendant Shoman has been filed.]

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.