This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2021 at 09:47:29 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ROGER DELGADO

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROGER DELGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6504

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

DELGADO ROGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENCHEL ROBIN F

Defendant Attorney

BORROMEO IRENE GAVIOLA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/4/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/4/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/4/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Answer - Answer

9/23/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ROGER DELGADO (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROGER DELGADO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/19/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROGER DELGADO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROGER DELGADO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ROGER DELGADO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENCHEL ROBIN F