This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 00:51:39 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS RAYMOND IVAN DUMBRIQUE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAYMOND IVAN DUMBRIQUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6496

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DUMBRIQUE CHRISTIAAN A.

DUMBRIQUE RAYMOND IVAN

Cross Defendant

LORDEN TERRI NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

GENCHEL ROBIN F

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

YEE DOUGLAS S.

NETTELS CHARLES F.

PEHLEVANIAN MICHAEL Z.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/23/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order .

9/3/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order .

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

9/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/3/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/3/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/9/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/6/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

11/12/2019: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

9/9/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

9/17/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/20/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

7/11/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/11/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 07/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by RAYMOND IVAN DUMBRIQUE, et al. on 09/09/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CHRISTIAAN A. DUMBRIQUE and RAYMOND IVAN DUMBRIQUE as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketAddress for Robin F Genchel (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 12/14/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAddress for Charles F. Nettels (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAddress for Douglas S. Yee (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Charles F. Nettels (Attorney): Organization Name: Freeburh & Nettels

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: RAYMOND IVAN DUMBRIQUE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/26/2019; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTIAAN A. DUMBRIQUE (Defendant); Service Date: 07/22/2019; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: RAYMOND IVAN DUMBRIQUE (Defendant); CHRISTIAAN A. DUMBRIQUE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: RAYMOND IVAN DUMBRIQUE (Defendant); CHRISTIAAN A. DUMBRIQUE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: RAYMOND IVAN DUMBRIQUE (Defendant); CHRISTIAAN A. DUMBRIQUE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06496    Hearing Date: September 03, 2020    Dept: 26

TENTATIVE RULING

Douglas S. Yee, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Christiaan A. Dumbrique is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. THIS RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF CORRECTED, SIGNED ORDERS UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENCHEL ROBIN F