This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 00:19:15 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS RAUL MAYORGA

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against RAUL MAYORGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6532

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

MAYORGA RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorney

HANFF ROBERT ATLEE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/24/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/15/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and All Related Dates

1/4/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and All Related Dates

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default

10/28/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

7/15/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/15/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 07/15/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAddress for Richard L. Mahfouz (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/22/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Raul Mayorga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 07/15/2019, Default entered on 09/11/2019, Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Set Aside Default; Signed and Filed by: Raul Mayorga (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default: Filed By: Raul Mayorga (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Mayorga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Raul Mayorga; On the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Mayorga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Mayorga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Mayorga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.