This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 06:03:57 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS OSCAR R. GUZMAN

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSCAR R GUZMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6985

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

GUZMAN OSCAR R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGPAPIAN MANUEL M

Defendant Attorneys

YEE DOUGLAS S.

TSENG JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/02/2021

9/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/02/2021

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/2/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/15/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/15/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

12/18/2020: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

9/21/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

9/30/2020: Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/30/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

9/30/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

9/30/2020: Answer - Answer

Order (name extension) - Order to Opt out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial

10/6/2020: Order (name extension) - Order to Opt out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial

Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

10/6/2020: Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/18/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2023
  • Hearing08/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Hearing02/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: OSCAR R. GUZMAN (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/02/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 09/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/02/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 09/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: OSCAR R. GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: OSCAR R. GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: OSCAR R. GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR R. GUZMAN (Defendant); Mailing Date: 09/01/2020; Service Cost: 70.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR R. GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR R. GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR R. GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC06985 Hearing Date: September 2, 2021 Dept: 26

TENTATIVE RULING

Motion of Douglas S. Yee, Esq. of Gilsleider, McMahon, Molinelli & Phan, to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant Oscar R. Guzman is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDER HAS BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE DEMONTRATING SERVICE OF SIGNED AND CORRECTED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

'b'

Case Number: 20STLC06985 Hearing Date: September 1, 2021 Dept: 26

State Farm v. Guzman, et\r\nal. 20STLC06985

MOTION TO BE\r\nRELIEVED AS COUNSEL

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 284(2); CRC\r\nRule 3.1362)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Motion of Douglas S. Yee, Esq. of\r\nGilsleider, McMahon, Molinelli & Phan, to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant\r\nOscar R. Guzman is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDER HAS BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE\r\nEFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE DEMONTRATING SERVICE OF SIGNED AND\r\nCORRECTED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAGPAPIAN MANUEL M