Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 05:00:05 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS MOISES GUTIERREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOISES GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1604

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GUTIERREZ MOISES

GUTIERREZ ISIDORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOURO JENNY ROSE

Defendant Attorney

KIM LEAH J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/19/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/19/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/4/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/6/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

1/18/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

1/18/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/24/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/24/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

9/10/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - of Venue

9/10/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Venue

Complaint

9/10/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/10/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moises Gutierrez (Defendant); Isidora Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 09/10/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 04/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/19/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 04/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 03/04/2020 to 03/04/2020; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moises Gutierrez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/19/2018; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Isidora Gutierrez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/19/2018; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moises Gutierrez (Defendant); Isidora Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less