This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2020 at 01:19:54 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS MICHAEL JUSTIN DIONNE

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL JUSTIN DIONNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4077

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

DIONNE MICHAEL JUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOURO JENNY R

Defendant Attorney

SERAFANO DONALD BLAKE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, AND ALL RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES, AND ORDER

8/31/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, AND ALL RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES, AND ORDER

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

9/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Answer - Answer

10/21/2019: Answer - Answer

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

1/28/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/28/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

1/28/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/28/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Deem Requ...) of 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Deem Requ...) of 03/24/2020

Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Michael

6/3/2019: Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Michael

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/18/2019: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF KYLE CREASEY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

4/12/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF KYLE CREASEY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BREANNE L REESE ESQ IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

4/12/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF BREANNE L REESE ESQ IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

Application for Publication - Application for Order to Publish

4/12/2019: Application for Publication - Application for Order to Publish

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF MERIT

4/12/2019: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF MERIT

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/19/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

11/19/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/19/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

11/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • Hearing03/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted: Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/08/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketResponse TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS OF ADMISSIONS ADMITED AND DECLARATION OF LEAH J. KIM; Filed by: MICHAEL JUSTIN DIONNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, AND ALL RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES, AND ORDER; Filed by: MICHAEL JUSTIN DIONNE (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 03/08/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration OF KYLE CREASEY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JUSTIN DIONNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JUSTIN DIONNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JUSTIN DIONNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL JUSTIN DIONNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC14077    Hearing Date: September 08, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Michael Justin Dionne is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $260.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER

ANALYSIS:

On October 31, 2019, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Michael Justin Dionne (“Defendant”). (Motion, Pleasant Decl., Exh. A.) On January 9, 2020, Plaintiff sent a meet and confer letter to defense counsel and extended the deadline to serve responses. (Id. at Exh. B.) As of the filing of the instant Motion to Deem Requests for Admission on January 28, 2020, Plaintiff had not received any responses to the discovery requests propounded on Defendant. (Id. at p. 2:3.) To date, no opposition to the Motion has been filed.

Due to Defendant’s failure to serve verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff, the requests for admission are deemed admitted. The Court also finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are mandatory under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $260.00, based on one hour of attorney time billed at $200.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Id. at p. 2:8-11.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Michael Justin Dionne is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $260.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: 18STLC14077    Hearing Date: September 03, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Michael Justin Dionne is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $260.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER

ANALYSIS:

On October 31, 2019, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Michael Justin Dionne (“Defendant”). (Motion, Pleasant Decl., Exh. A.) On January 9, 2020, Plaintiff sent a meet and confer letter to defense counsel and extended the deadline to serve responses. (Id. at Exh. B.) As of the filing of the instant Motion to Deem Requests for Admission on January 28, 2020, Plaintiff had not received any responses to the discovery requests propounded on Defendant. (Id. at p. 2:3.) To date, no opposition to the Motion has been filed.

Due to Defendant’s failure to serve verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff, the requests for admission are deemed admitted. The Court also finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are mandatory under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $260.00, based on one hour of attorney time billed at $200.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Id. at p. 2:8-11.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Michael Justin Dionne is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $260.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.