Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 03:01:45 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LUIS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LUIS GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7523

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

GARCIA LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorney

SMITH HILARY W

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

9/18/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

9/18/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/18/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

9/18/2020: Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures - Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Order (name extension) - Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

9/25/2020: Order (name extension) - Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

9/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Hearing03/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures; Filed by: Luis Garcia (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Luis Garcia (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Luis Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest to Opt Out of Mandatory Expedited Jury Trial Procedures; Filed by: Luis Garcia (Defendant); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Luis Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Garcia (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/06/2020; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.