This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 08:09:50 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS LESTHER VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LESTHER VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5159

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

VASQUEZ LESTHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE BREANNE L.

Defendant Attorney

MONTY LAUREEN A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/14/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

1/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

11/8/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

11/8/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/8/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/8/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

7/23/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

7/23/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

5/29/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/29/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/29/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

5/29/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Hearing11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LESTHER VASQUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 01/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/13/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTHER VASQUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTHER VASQUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 01/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTHER VASQUEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/05/2019; Service Cost: 79.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTHER VASQUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTHER VASQUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTHER VASQUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: LESTHER VASQUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05159    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 94

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Admitted Matters served on Defendant Lesther Vasquez, is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $460.00 WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On August 9, 2019, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Lesther Vasquez (“Defendant”). (Motion, Pleasant Decl., Exh. A.) To date, Plaintiff has not received verified responses to the discovery requests from Defendant. (Id. at p. 2:1-5.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions to Defendant as Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on November 8, 2019.

Defendant has not provided verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff nor filed an opposition to the motion. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses.

The Court finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are appropriate under CCP §§ 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $460.00, based on two hours of attorney time billed at $200.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Motion, Pleasant Decl., p. 2:6-9.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted is GRANTED.

DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $460.00 WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.